OK HB3114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Empowering Teachers to Lead Act; effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Empowering Teachers to Lead Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Martin [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Ann Coody [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 62 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 18 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-09 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2016 |
2016-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-02 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 24 |
2016-05-02 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 31 |
2016-03-07 | House | Motion to suspend House rules failed |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Coody (Ann) |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Martin |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 6 | 301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |