OK HB3099 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act; tax credits; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Affordable Housing Act; tax credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Richard Morrissette [D] |
Rep. Skye McNiel [R] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Emily Virgin [D] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 13 |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Griffin |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morrissette, Pittman, Virgin |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Title stricken |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McNiel, Denney |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Jackson |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |