OK HB3095 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Landlord tenant; preemption; retaliation; effective date.
Title
Landlord tenant; preemption; retaliation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Dollens |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 10 |
2024-03-13 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens |
2024-03-13 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules |
2024-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Tedford |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |