OK HB3079 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County fire departments; directors; qualifications; effective date; emergency.
Title
County fire departments; directors; qualifications; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2022 |
2022-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2022-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2022-04-28 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-07 | House | General Order |
2022-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Smith |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |