OK HB3076 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Emergency added
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; retail spirits license; permitting sampling of alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; brand labels; prohibited acts; employee sampling training; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; retail spirits license; permitting sampling of alcoholic beverages under certain circumstances; brand labels; prohibited acts; employee sampling training; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Hays [R] | Sen. Bill Coleman [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 35 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 35 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [FAIL]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Emergency added |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 59 Nays: 19; Ayes: 35 Nays: 43 |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-29 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hays |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |