OK HB3074 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; Vessel and Motor Registration Act; exempting canoes, kayaks and paddleboats from title and registration requirements; effective date.
Title
Public safety; Vessel and Motor Registration Act; exempting canoes, kayaks and paddleboats from title and registration requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | House | Died in conference |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2018-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Rules |
2018-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Finance sub-committee |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Worthen |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |