OK HB3059 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; alcoholic beverage licenses; motion picture theaters; effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; alcoholic beverage licenses; motion picture theaters; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 14 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-09 | House | Motion expired |
2016-03-07 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Newell |
2016-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 77 |
2016-03-07 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Newell |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |