OK HB3055 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; affordable housing tax credits; taxable years; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; affordable housing tax credits; taxable years; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |