OK HB3027 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; direct wine shipping; Direct Wine Consumer's Permit; repealer; duplicate section; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; direct wine shipping; Direct Wine Consumer's Permit; repealer; duplicate section; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Banking and Business Committee: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-15 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 10 |
2018-03-15 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-15 | House | General Order |
2018-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Virgin |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |