OK HB3017 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Healthcare; creating the Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment Act; effective date.
Title
Healthcare; creating the Physician Orders for Life-Sustaining Treatment Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-19 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-25 | Senate | coauthored by Newberry |
2016-05-19 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-19 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-19 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 11 |
2016-05-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Johnson, Lepak, Cleveland, Faught, Kern |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart |
2016-05-17 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Standridge, Crain, Yen, David, Paddack, Pittman |
2016-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 10 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by Crain |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-02-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 22 |
2016-02-25 | House | General Order |
2016-02-15 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Calvey |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1072 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3103 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3103 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3103 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3103 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3103 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3105 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3105 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3105 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3105 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 3105 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |