OK HB3007 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-11 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; Cemetery Merchandise Trust Act; definitions; minimum funding requirement; effective date.
Title
Insurance; Cemetery Merchandise Trust Act; definitions; minimum funding requirement; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Sen. Cody Rogers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Retirement And Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-08 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred to County and Municipal Government |
2022-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Sims |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |