OK HB3006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Counties and county officers; relating to county purchasing procedures; modifying requirement for approval of payments by board of county commissioners; providing procedures for county audits. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Counties and county officers; relating to county purchasing procedures; modifying requirement for approval of payments by board of county commissioners; providing procedures for county audits. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Approved by Governor 04/09/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-15 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-23 | First Reading | |
2010-02-23 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-22 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2010-02-22 | General Order | |
2010-02-16 | Authored by Senator Bingman (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Peterson | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 1505 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
19 | 177 | 2 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 331 | New Code | See Bill Text |