OK HB3005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; net benefit rate; effective date; emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; Oklahoma Quality Jobs Program Act; net benefit rate; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. David Holt [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Motion expired | |
2012-03-12 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Kern | |
2012-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 47 | |
2012-03-12 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kern | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |