OK HB3000 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/12/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Roads and bridges; creating the Trail Of Tears Historic Bike Route; requiring signage; requiring shoulder; effective date.
Title
Roads and bridges; creating the Trail Of Tears Historic Bike Route; requiring signage; requiring shoulder; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Wayne Shaw [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | House | Approved by Governor 04/12/2016 |
2016-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-07 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 18 |
2016-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer, Hoskin |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Shaw (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |