OK HB2999 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Mental health; relating to the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; modify term of office; making maintenance of certain facilities discretionary; relating to report required for vulnerable adult suffering abuse; adding municipal employees; providing services by certified alcohol and drug counselors providers through certain date. Effective date.
Title
Mental health; relating to the Board of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services; modify term of office; making maintenance of certain facilities discretionary; relating to report required for vulnerable adult suffering abuse; adding municipal employees; providing services by certified alcohol and drug counselors providers through certain date. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-17 - House - House: (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-24 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-24 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-24 | Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | |
2010-05-24 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted | |
2010-05-24 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Adelson | |
2010-05-24 | Ayes: 21 Nays: 25 | |
2010-05-24 | CCR failed of adoption, GCCA | |
2010-05-17 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-17 | To Senate | |
2010-05-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8 | |
2010-05-17 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-04-27 | HC's named: Steele, McDaniel (Jeannie), Hickman, McCullough, Pruett, DeWitt | |
2010-04-19 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-15 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-07 | SA's received | |
2010-04-07 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-06 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-06 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-06 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Pittman | |
2010-03-29 | Remove as author Senator Brown; authored by Senator Crain | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-22 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-03-16 | Pending removal author Senator Brown and replace with Senator Crain | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McAffrey | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43A | 10 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 2 | 103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
43A | 3 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |