OK HB2997 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Definitions and general provisions; designating the red-tailed hawk as the state raptor; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions and general provisions; designating the red-tailed hawk as the state raptor; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House: Wildlife Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HouseApproved by Governor 04/30/2018
2018-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2018-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2018-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2018-04-23SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2018-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2018-04-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2018-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2018-04-09SenateReported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
2018-04-04SenateCoauthored by Senator Pittman
2018-03-29SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2018-03-21SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-15HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2018-03-15HouseAuthored by Senator Dossett (principal Senate author)
2018-03-15HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Ritze
2018-03-15HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Wildlife Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Wildlife
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Munson
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
259817Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2997&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB2997%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB2997%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB2997%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB2997%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB2997%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB2997_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2997_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2997_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback