OK HB2995 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Corporation Commission; requiring courier application service and restaurants have certain agreement; effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Corporation Commission; requiring courier application service and restaurants have certain agreement; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 51 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | House | Approved by Governor 05/15/2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 29 |
2024-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-04-25 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 63 Nays: 13 |
2024-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-11 | House | Amended |
2024-03-11 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Luttrell |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |