OK HB2995 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County and county officers; county commissioners; modifying general powers of board; effective date.
Title
County and county officers; county commissioners; modifying general powers of board; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Rep. Tom Newell [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Approved by Governor 04/25/2012 | |
2012-04-19 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-01 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | Authored by Senator Ivester (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Newell | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |