OK HB2991 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
Pending: Senate Appr/Sub-Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-02 - Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance
Pending: Senate Appr/Sub-Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; revenue reporting requirements; Oklahoma Tax Commission; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; revenue reporting requirements; Oklahoma Tax Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Finance |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-01 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-15 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative McEntire |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |