OK HB2986 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative Kendrix
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - Coauthored by Representative Kendrix
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; vehicle excise tax; value definition; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; vehicle excise tax; value definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bashore [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] |
Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Gerrid Kendrix [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Kendrix |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Davis |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell (Chad) |
2022-03-07 | House | General Order |
2022-02-17 | House | Title stricken |
2022-02-17 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2022-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter |
2022-02-17 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-02-08 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-02-07 | House | Authored by Representative Bashore, Frix |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading |