OK HB2986 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-30 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; relating to requirements of a home care agency; prohibiting licensed health care facility from referring client for certain services except to licensed agency. Effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; relating to requirements of a home care agency; prohibiting licensed health care facility from referring client for certain services except to licensed agency. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-08 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-08 | Amended | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Ford (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Schwartz | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 1 | 1962 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 1972 | New Code | See Bill Text |