OK HB2962 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Revenue and taxation; individual income tax rates; earned income tax credit; computation of credit; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; individual income tax rates; earned income tax credit; computation of credit; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24HouseApproved by Governor 05/21/2021
2021-05-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-05-20SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-20HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2021-05-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2021-05-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2021-05-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9
2021-05-20SenateJCR adopted
2021-05-19SenateDirect to Calendar
2021-05-18SenateFirst Reading
2021-05-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-05-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-05-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 19
2021-05-18HouseJCR adopted
2021-05-18HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lepak
2021-05-18HouseGeneral Order
2021-05-17HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Russ
2021-05-17HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2021-05-17HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Thompson
2021-05-17HouseRemove Senator Thompson as principal Senate author and substitute with Senator Treat
2021-05-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Wallace
2021-05-13HouseRemove Representative Wallace as principal House author and substitute with Representative McCall
2021-04-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2021-04-28HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Hall
2021-04-28HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2021-04-28HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2962&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2962%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2962%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2962%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2962%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/hB/HB2962%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2962%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-MAH.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2962%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2962%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2962_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2962_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback