OK HB2946 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Coauthored by Senator Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Coauthored by Senator Stephens
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; creating Lauria and Ashley's Law; adding criminal offense to list of crimes; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; creating Lauria and Ashley's Law; adding criminal offense to list of crimes; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bashore [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] | Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Neil Hays [R] | Rep. John George [R] | Rep. Anthony Moore [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2024-02-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-02-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-02-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 13 |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fetgatter, Sims, George, Hays |
2024-02-21 | House | General Order |
2024-02-12 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Moore |
2024-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Bashore |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |