OK HB2932 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; coin-operated music and amusement devices; requiring notices; limiting device seizure; repealer; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; coin-operated music and amusement devices; requiring notices; limiting device seizure; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2016 |
2016-04-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-19 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2016-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2016-03-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-09 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2016-03-09 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2016-03-09 | House | General Order |
2016-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-09 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee sub-committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCullough |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |