OK HB2931 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-22 - Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by federally recognized Indian tribes on certain property; effective date.
Title
Schools; authorizing sponsorship of charter schools by federally recognized Indian tribes on certain property; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 14 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-02-25 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-22 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 27 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 21 |
2014-05-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2014-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Loveless, Ford, Paddack, Jolley, Holt, Sparks |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2014-04-21 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 26 Nays: 17 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 12 |
2014-03-05 | House | General Order |
2014-02-26 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-26 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |