OK HB2924 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - Second Reading referred to Energy
Pending: Senate Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Cities and towns; limiting acquisition of water rights to ten-year term; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; limiting acquisition of water rights to ten-year term; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Armes [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 | |
2012-03-13 | Title stricken | |
2012-03-13 | Amended | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-15 | Authored by Senator Marlatt (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-15 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Armes | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |