OK HB2922 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; allowing parents or guardians and teachers to make retention decision under certain circumstances; providing certain exemption from end-of-instruction tests; emergency.
Title
Schools; allowing parents or guardians and teachers to make retention decision under certain circumstances; providing certain exemption from end-of-instruction tests; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Coody [R] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Rep. Jeannie McDaniel [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2014-03-13 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2014-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 10 |
2014-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roberts (Dustin), McDaniel (Jeannie), Russ |
2014-03-12 | House | General Order |
2014-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Coody |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 1210 | 508C | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 1210 | 523 | New Code | See Bill Text |