OK HB2919 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Airports; creating the Aircraft Pilot and Passenger Protection Act. Effective date.
Title
Airports; creating the Aircraft Pilot and Passenger Protection Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/07/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shannon, Ritze, Pittman | |
2010-05-27 | Remove Representative Shannon as principal House author and substitute with Representative Morgan | |
2010-05-27 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-05-27 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-25 | Emergency removed | |
2010-05-25 | Title restored | |
2010-05-25 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-04 | HC's named: Shannon, Joyner, Morgan, Banz, Jackson, McAffrey | |
2010-05-03 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-21 | SA's received | |
2010-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-20 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | |
2010-04-20 | coauthored by Easley, Coates | |
2010-04-20 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Williams, Cox, Wright (Harold) | |
2010-04-06 | coauthored by Corn | |
2010-04-05 | Title stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-30 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Corn | |
2010-03-24 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation sub-committee | |
2010-03-23 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Cox, Wright (John) | |
2010-03-22 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Williams | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to Appr/Sub-General Government and Transportation | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 | |
2010-03-08 | Authored by Senator Myers (principal Senate author) | |
2010-03-08 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell | |
2010-03-08 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Morgan | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Shannon | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 100 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 120 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 120 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |