OK HB2885 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2885
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Regents for Higher Education; making an appropriation; identifying source; purpose; emergency.
Title
State Regents for Higher Education; making an appropriation; identifying source; purpose; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations And Budget: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 04/17/2023 |
2023-04-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | JCR adopted |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2023-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-04-10 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-10 | House | JCR adopted |
2023-04-10 | House | General Order |
2023-04-05 | House | Emergency added |
2023-04-05 | House | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-21 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-21 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2885 (Carry Over) 2023-04-17 - Approved by Governor 04/17/2023