OK HB2877 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health; law enforcement transportation; mental health services; telemedicine; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health; law enforcement transportation; mental health services; telemedicine; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07SenateTitle stricken
2021-04-07SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2021-03-23SenateCoauthored by Senator Bullard
2021-03-22SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-03-22SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2021-03-15SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2021-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2021-03-03HouseReferred for engrossment
2021-03-03HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3
2021-03-03HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Fugate
2021-03-03HouseGeneral Order
2021-02-25HouseAuthored by Senator Taylor (principal Senate author)
2021-02-25HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2021-02-02HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2021-02-01HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace
2021-02-01HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb2877&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/hB/HB2877%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB2877%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/HB2877%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/hB/HB2877%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/HB2877%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/House/HB2877%20FULLPCS1%20KEVIN%20WALLACE-JM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2877%20FULLPCS1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2877%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB2877%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/HB2877%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/impact%20statements/fiscal/senate/HB2877%20ENGR%20FI.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB2877_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB2877_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback