OK HB2869 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-29 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; modifying restricted places for the unlawful carry of firearms; effective date.
Title
Firearms; modifying restricted places for the unlawful carry of firearms; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Christian |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |