OK HB2858 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Children; requiring notification about voluntary adoption placement when a child is taken into emergency custody; effective date.
Title
Children; requiring notification about voluntary adoption placement when a child is taken into emergency custody; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy West [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2018-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 |
2018-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-14 | House | Amended |
2018-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2018-03-14 | House | General Order |
2018-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |