OK HB2854 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating the Energy Content Tax Act of 2018; rates of taxation; exemptions; apportionment.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating the Energy Content Tax Act of 2018; rates of taxation; exemptions; apportionment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2018-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2018-02-26 | House | Withdrawn from Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2018-02-19 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Park |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |