OK HB2835 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - Referred to Business and Labor
Pending: Senate Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - Referred to Business and Labor
Pending: Senate Business and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; requiring certain owners to provide tenants with a plan of shelter or evacuation plan. Effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; requiring certain owners to provide tenants with a plan of shelter or evacuation plan. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 53 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Referred to Business and Labor | |
2010-03-25 | Withdrawn from Rules committee | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | First Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-10 | Motion expired | |
2010-03-04 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Ownbey | |
2010-03-04 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 44 | |
2010-03-04 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman, Buck | |
2010-03-04 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | Authored by Senator Crutchfield (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |