OK HB2834 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - coauthored by Moore
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-07 - coauthored by Moore
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Firearms; clarifying scope of certain prohibited act; effective date.
Title
Firearms; clarifying scope of certain prohibited act; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Sean Roberts [R] | Rep. Chuck Strohm [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Moore |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Ritze |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Strohm |
2016-04-07 | Senate | coauthored by Roberts (Sean) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 3 |
2016-03-02 | House | General Order |
2016-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett |
2016-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 1289 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1289 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |