OK HB2831 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Department of Consumer Credit; authorizing establishment of fees and civil penalties by rule; modifying procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Department of Consumer Credit; authorizing establishment of fees and civil penalties by rule; modifying procedures. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 34 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2010-05-27 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 25 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: PREV QUESTION (Y: 44 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: TABLE MOTION (Y: 25 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2010-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/09/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 | |
2010-05-28 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-28 | 2 CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18 | |
2010-05-27 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 71 Nays: 18 | |
2010-05-27 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Peters | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 27; Ayes: 34 Nays: 52 | |
2010-05-27 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-26 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-25 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-25 | CCR rejected, further conference requested, GCCA | |
2010-05-25 | Fourth Reading reconsidered | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-25 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Coffee | |
2010-05-25 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2010-05-25 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2010-05-20 | To Senate | |
2010-05-20 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 23 | |
2010-05-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton | |
2010-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2010-05-13 | Title restored | |
2010-05-13 | CCR submitted | |
2010-05-05 | HC's named: Peters, Liebmann, Sullivan, Carey, Dorman | |
2010-05-04 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2010-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2010-04-26 | SA's received | |
2010-04-26 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-04-21 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-21 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 | |
2010-04-21 | coauthored by Newberry | |
2010-04-21 | Remove as author Senator Newberry; authored by Senator Myers | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | |
2010-04-21 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Newberry | |
2010-04-21 | Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 33 | |
2010-04-21 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2010-04-06 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2010-04-06 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-04-05 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-10 | First Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-09 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 27 | |
2010-03-09 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-03-09 | General Order | |
2010-02-25 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-25 | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-25 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Peters | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 3 | 503 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 505 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 3 | 506 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 106A | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 512 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
24 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 144 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 145 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 146 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
24 | 148 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1505 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1506 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1507 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1508 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1515 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1525 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1526 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1528 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1532 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 1953 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1955 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1956 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 1956 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2002 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2009 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2011 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2093 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 2095 | 16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 26 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 2095 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 3113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 3115 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 3117 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 3118 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 3119 | New Code | See Bill Text |