OK HB2795 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-06 - Second Reading referred to General Government
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; expanding liability exemption for medical costs related to self-inflicted injuries; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; expanding liability exemption for medical costs related to self-inflicted injuries; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 13 |
2020-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns |
2020-03-05 | House | General Order |
2020-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Bergstrom (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen |
2020-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2020-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Hardin (David) |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |