OK HB2788 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2788
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Safe sleep; removing certain duty of State Board of Health; requiring retailers to comply with certain requirements; effective date.
Title
Safe sleep; removing certain duty of State Board of Health; requiring retailers to comply with certain requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 3 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2023-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 10 |
2023-03-07 | House | General Order |
2023-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Rogers (principal Senate author) |
2023-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Stinson |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2788 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023