OK HB2787 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Approved by Governor 05/25/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Banks and trust companies; providing for affidavit of heirship for safe deposit boxes; effective date.
Title
Banks and trust companies; providing for affidavit of heirship for safe deposit boxes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-23 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 85 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House: Conference Committee on Insurance: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Approved by Governor 05/25/2012 | |
2012-05-24 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-24 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-23 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-23 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-23 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-21 | CCR read | |
2012-05-21 | To Senate | |
2012-05-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 2 | |
2012-05-21 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-17 | Title restored | |
2012-05-17 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Sykes, Crain, Burrage, Ivester, Anderson | |
2012-04-26 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance and Economic Development | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Amended | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading | |
2012-02-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-02-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 | |
2012-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2012-02-23 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Ortega | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |