OK HB2779 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Banks and trust companies; modifying various provisions of the Banking Code. Emergency.
Title
Banks and trust companies; modifying various provisions of the Banking Code. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-16 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Approved by Governor 04/09/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-06 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-05 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-05 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2010-04-05 | Title restored | |
2010-04-05 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-17 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-17 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading | |
2010-02-17 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-02-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-02-16 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 5 | |
2010-02-16 | General Order | |
2010-02-10 | Emergency added | |
2010-02-10 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-10 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Economic Development and Financial Services Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Ownbey | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
6 | 1202 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 1205 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 201 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 209 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
6 | 306 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 306 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 307 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
6 | 414 | New Code | See Bill Text |