OK HB2775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Approved by Governor 04/09/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oil and gas; payment of proceeds from oil and gas production; effective date.
Title
Oil and gas; payment of proceeds from oil and gas production; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 62 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 04/09/2018 |
2018-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-02 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 62 Nays: 25 |
2018-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn (Mike) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |