OK HB2775 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-19 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma State Department of Health; authorizing contract with vendor to provide electronic benefit transfer. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma State Department of Health; authorizing contract with vendor to provide electronic benefit transfer. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] | Rep. Dale DeWitt [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] |
Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Jabar Shumate [D] | Rep. Kris Steele [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Health & Social Services: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-19 | Approved by Governor 04/16/2010 | |
2010-04-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-12 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-12 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-08 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-04-08 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2010-04-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-08 | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version | |
2010-04-08 | Title restored | |
2010-04-08 | General Order, Amended | |
2010-03-29 | coauthored by Jett, Pittman | |
2010-03-29 | Title stricken | |
2010-03-29 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-03-22 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services sub-committee | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Health and Human Services | |
2010-03-09 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Jett, Pittman | |
2010-03-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox, Sherrer, Tibbs, McAffrey, Dorman, Shumate, DeWitt | |
2010-03-01 | General Order | |
2010-02-23 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2010-02-23 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton, Hickman, Jackson, Denney | |
2010-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Representative Steele | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |