OK HB2758 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Developmental disabilities; establishing a voucher waiver program for caregivers of persons with developmental disabilities; effective date.
Title
Developmental disabilities; establishing a voucher waiver program for caregivers of persons with developmental disabilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Leslie Osborn [R] | Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Carol Bush [R] |
Rep. Marcus McEntire [R] | Rep. Josh West [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | coauthored by Wallace |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2 |
2018-03-12 | House | Title stricken |
2018-03-12 | House | Amended |
2018-03-12 | House | General Order |
2018-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2018-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh), Bush, McEntire |
2018-03-05 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |