OK HB2751 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-25 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; modifying Insurance Department revolving fund provisions; effective date.
Title
Insurance; modifying Insurance Department revolving fund provisions; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Brown [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] | Sen. Ralph Shortey [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Died in conference | |
2012-05-02 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2012-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-18 | SA's received | |
2012-04-18 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-17 | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 13 | |
2012-04-17 | coauthored by Shortey | |
2012-04-17 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-09 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-04-02 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-04-02 | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 1; Ayes: 49 Nays: 17 | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-16 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-16 | Authored by Senator Brown (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-16 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Kirby | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 307 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 307 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |