OK HB2738 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Soldiers and sailors; State Accrediting Agency; repealer; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Soldiers and sailors; State Accrediting Agency; repealer; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenateDirect to Calendar
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-21HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0
2019-02-21HouseJCR adopted
2019-02-21HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseEmergency added
2019-02-20HouseJCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-18HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Rader
2019-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Thompson (principal Senate author)
2019-02-18HouseAuthored by Representative Wallace, Hilbert
2019-02-18HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback