OK HB2734 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-26 - Coauthored by Senator Pugh
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; allowing professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; allowing professional development program to include consent and healthy relationships education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-07 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Pugh
2018-03-21SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2018-03-20SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2018-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2018-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2018-03-12HouseMotion expired
2018-03-07HouseEmergency failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 37
2018-03-07HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Rosecrants
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 34
2018-03-07HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sparks
2018-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
2018-03-07HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Gaddis, Young, Griffith, Virgin, Osborn (Leslie), Bush, McEntire, Kannady, Lawson, West (Josh), Henke
2018-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2018-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2018-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2018-02-05HouseAuthored by Representative Rosecrants
2018-02-05HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7024100New CodeSee Bill Text
706194New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback