OK HB2733 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2733
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Indigenous persons; Ida's Law; Office of Liaison for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons; requirements; effective date.
Title
Indigenous persons; Ida's Law; Office of Liaison for Missing and Murdered Indigenous Persons; requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2021-02-09 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2021-02-09 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Pittman |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2733 (Carry Over) 2021-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee