OK HB2724 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2724
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Coauthored by Senator Haste
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-10 - Coauthored by Senator Haste
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Housing; creating the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Commission; effective date.
Title
Housing; creating the Oklahoma Affordable Housing Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] | Rep. Mickey Dollens [D] | Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] |
Rep. Annie Menz [D] | Sen. Chuck Hall [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 52 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Haste |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hall |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Brooks; authored by Kirt |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2024-03-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 30; Ayes: 52 Nays: 30 |
2024-03-14 | House | Title stricken |
2024-03-14 | House | Amended |
2024-03-14 | House | Emergency added |
2024-03-14 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Brooks (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Menz, Dollens |
2024-03-14 | House | General Order |
2024-03-14 | House | Remove Representative Menz as principal House author and substitute with Representative Blancett |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Menz |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2724 (Carry Over) 2023-03-02 - CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee