OK HB2720 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Ayes: 32 Nays: 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-20 - Ayes: 32 Nays: 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing for legislative action in response to certain congressional enactments related to sales or use taxation; creating Marketplace Equalization Fund; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing for legislative action in response to certain congressional enactments related to sales or use taxation; creating Marketplace Equalization Fund; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] | Rep. Gary Banz [R] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Rep. Michael Jackson [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Rick Brinkley [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House: Appropriations/Sub-Revenue and Tax committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-20 | House | Ayes: 32 Nays: 59 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR failed of adoption |
2014-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-16 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Denney, Banz, Jackson |
2014-05-16 | House | Remove Representative Banz as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sears |
2014-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2014-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2014-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Brinkley |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-24 | Senate | coauthored by Dahm |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2014-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-04 | House | General Order |
2014-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Banz |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 1354 | 6A | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2355 | 1D | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |