OK HB2703 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; vital statistics records; expanding list of individuals who may inspect certain records; requiring State Department of Health to make available certain online index; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; vital statistics records; expanding list of individuals who may inspect certain records; requiring State Department of Health to make available certain online index; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-27 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2016-05-27 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2016-05-26 | Senate | CCR read |
2016-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2016-05-26 | House | CCR adopted |
2016-05-19 | House | Enacting clause restored |
2016-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2016-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Holt, Standridge, Bice, Loveless, Shaw, Wyrick, Paddack |
2016-04-26 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Health |
2016-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2016-04-11 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2016-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 4 |
2016-03-01 | House | General Order |
2016-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2016-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2016-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-02-10 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2016-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |